Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2411 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 16, 2023
Analysis January 30, 2023