Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2427 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis January 26, 2023
Analysis January 23, 2023