Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2447 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 8, 2023
Fiscal Note February 3, 2023
Bill January 12, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023