Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2449 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 2, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023
Analysis January 30, 2023