Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2456 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 23, 2023
Analysis May 2, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 1, 2023
Analysis January 27, 2023

Chaptered

Bill May 4, 2023