Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2458 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 1, 2023
Analysis January 27, 2023