Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2460 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 13, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis January 25, 2023
Analysis January 20, 2023