Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2485 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Chaptered

Bill May 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 15, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023