Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2489 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2023

Chaptered

Bill May 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 10, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023