Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2501 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 30, 2023
Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis January 26, 2023
Analysis January 20, 2023