Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2502 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 24, 2023
Analysis May 22, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis February 1, 2023
Analysis January 31, 2023