LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2509
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona House Bill HB2509
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2023 Regular Session
Arizona House Bill HB2509
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 17, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 29, 2023
Compare
Bill
February 21, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
May 2, 2023
Analysis
April 19, 2023
Analysis
April 12, 2023
Analysis
March 29, 2023
Analysis
March 13, 2023
Analysis
March 6, 2023
Analysis
February 23, 2023
Analysis
February 21, 2023
Analysis
February 10, 2023
Analysis
January 30, 2023