Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2533 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 15, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023