Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2534 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 30, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023

Chaptered

Bill May 4, 2023