Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2535 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 28, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023
Analysis February 3, 2023