Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2540 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023
Analysis February 2, 2023