Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2544 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 24, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 14, 2023