Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2547 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023

Chaptered

Bill April 19, 2023