Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2560 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 30, 2023
Analysis May 23, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023