Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2586 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 2, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 2, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023