Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2591 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023