Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2612 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 2, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023