LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2618
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona House Bill HB2618
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2023 Regular Session
Arizona House Bill HB2618
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 6, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
May 17, 2023
Compare
Bill
March 1, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
June 23, 2023
Analysis
June 20, 2023
Analysis
June 15, 2023
Analysis
June 13, 2023
Analysis
May 16, 2023
Analysis
March 30, 2023
Analysis
March 28, 2023
Analysis
March 6, 2023
Analysis
February 23, 2023
Analysis
February 12, 2023