Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2620 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 13, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023
Analysis February 15, 2023
Analysis February 11, 2023