House | 03/21/2023 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Assigned to House COM Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time |