Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2643 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023