Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2691 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023