Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2722 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 15, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis July 21, 2023
Analysis June 13, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023