Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (57-1-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (14-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Assigned to House MAPS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|