Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2754 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 14, 2023