House | 03/01/2023 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-7-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time |