House | 03/27/2023 | House motion to amend | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-5-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time |