Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Assigned to Senate NREW Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (43-15-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (13-2-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Assigned to House APPROP Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Assigned to House LARA Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|