Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2809 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 27, 2023
Bill February 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 12, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 15, 2023
Analysis June 12, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023