Senate | 05/19/2023 | Chapter 160 | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Governor Signed | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-6-2-0) | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2826 substituted for SB 1075. Motion carried. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-3-0-0) | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0) | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-5-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time |