Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HCM2006 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis February 23, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023
Analysis January 27, 2023