Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HCM2008 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis February 23, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023