Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HCR2033 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 29, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023