04/04/2023 | Transmitted to Secretary of State | |||
House | 03/30/2023 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (0-0-0-) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | House third reading PASSED voting: (---) | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time |