Arizona 2023 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HCR2037 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/27/2023

                    House Engrossed   Assyrian New Year; recognizing         State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023           HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION 2037                  A Concurrent Resolution   recognizing april 1, 2023 as the assyrian new year.     (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)   

 

House Engrossed   Assyrian New Year; recognizing
State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023
HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION 2037

House Engrossed

 

Assyrian New Year; recognizing

 

 

State of Arizona

House of Representatives

Fifty-sixth Legislature

First Regular Session

2023

 

 

 

HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION 2037

 

 

 

A Concurrent Resolution

 

recognizing april 1, 2023 as the assyrian new year.

 

 

(TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)

 

 Whereas, Assyrians, a Semitic people, are the indigenous people of Mesopotamia who have lived in the Middle East since ancient times, including in what is today Turkey, Iraq, Iran and Syria; and Whereas, Assyrians have been instrumental in developing major technological advances throughout world history, including irrigation systems, city canal systems, the wheel, the magnifying glass, arch and dome architecture, astronomical calculations, time measurement and much more; and Whereas, collectively there are more than 600,000 Assyrians in the United States, including tens of thousands in Arizona; and Whereas, the Assyrian New Year symbolizes a time of spring, rebirth and renewal and is one of the most revered traditions in modern and ancient Assyrian history; and Whereas, concluding on April 1, the Assyrian New Year is celebrated for 12 days by holding large celebrations, family gatherings, parades and festivals; and Whereas, the Assyrians of today will be celebrating the year 6773; and Whereas, the Assyrians are a proud and resourceful people who are productive members of American society and enrich American culture by contributing their talents in numerous fields, including accounting, aerospace, agriculture, architecture, education, engineering, finance, medicine, the military, motion picture and politics. Therefore Be it resolved by the House of Representatives of the State of Arizona, the Senate concurring: That the Members of the Legislature recognize April 1, 2023 as Assyrian New Year and honor the many contributions of Assyrians, both past and present. 

Whereas, Assyrians, a Semitic people, are the indigenous people of Mesopotamia who have lived in the Middle East since ancient times, including in what is today Turkey, Iraq, Iran and Syria; and

Whereas, Assyrians have been instrumental in developing major technological advances throughout world history, including irrigation systems, city canal systems, the wheel, the magnifying glass, arch and dome architecture, astronomical calculations, time measurement and much more; and

Whereas, collectively there are more than 600,000 Assyrians in the United States, including tens of thousands in Arizona; and

Whereas, the Assyrian New Year symbolizes a time of spring, rebirth and renewal and is one of the most revered traditions in modern and ancient Assyrian history; and

Whereas, concluding on April 1, the Assyrian New Year is celebrated for 12 days by holding large celebrations, family gatherings, parades and festivals; and

Whereas, the Assyrians of today will be celebrating the year 6773; and

Whereas, the Assyrians are a proud and resourceful people who are productive members of American society and enrich American culture by contributing their talents in numerous fields, including accounting, aerospace, agriculture, architecture, education, engineering, finance, medicine, the military, motion picture and politics.

Therefore

Be it resolved by the House of Representatives of the State of Arizona, the Senate concurring:

That the Members of the Legislature recognize April 1, 2023 as Assyrian New Year and honor the many contributions of Assyrians, both past and present.

       UNANIMOUSLY ADOPTED BY THE HOUSE MARCH 20, 2023.   UNANIMOUSLY ADOPTED BY THE SENATE MARCH 30, 2023.   FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE APRIL 4, 2023. 

 

 

 

UNANIMOUSLY ADOPTED BY THE HOUSE MARCH 20, 2023.

 

UNANIMOUSLY ADOPTED BY THE SENATE MARCH 30, 2023.

 

FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE APRIL 4, 2023.