Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HCR2043 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023