House | 03/29/2023 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (15-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-5-2-0) | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-1-1-0) | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Assigned to Senate COM Committee | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | Prefile |