Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1021 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis January 13, 2023