Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1026 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis July 14, 2023
Analysis June 20, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis February 9, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023