Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1028 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis July 14, 2023
Analysis June 26, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis February 7, 2023
Analysis January 31, 2023