Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1036 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis January 24, 2023

Chaptered

Bill March 28, 2023