Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1038 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023

Chaptered

Bill May 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 3, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis February 28, 2023
Analysis January 27, 2023
Analysis January 24, 2023