Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1040 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 12, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023
Analysis January 17, 2023
Analysis January 13, 2023