Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1044 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis January 23, 2023
Analysis January 18, 2023
Analysis January 13, 2023