Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1046 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 9, 2023
Fiscal Note February 9, 2023
Bill January 11, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis January 24, 2023